EP4298323 - TURBOJET ENGINE NOZZLE RING FOR AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFRAN AIRCRAFT ENGINES 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENT, Alice Marie 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 02 /
GRANDIN, Paul 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 03 /
MARCHAND, Clément 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 04 /
PATEL, Vijeay 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | 05 /
SANCHEZ GOMEZ, Mireya 77550 MOISSY-CRAMAYEL / FR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22710661.4 | 18.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022FR50299 | Priority number, date | FR20210001915 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: FR 2101915 | [2024/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022180329 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298323 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D11/00, F01D9/04 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP);
F01D9/04 (US);
F01D25/005 (US);
F01D25/28 (US);
F01D9/041 (EP);
F02K1/52 (US);
F05D2220/32 (EP);
F05D2220/3212 (EP);
F05D2220/323 (EP);
F05D2230/60 (EP);
F05D2230/70 (EP,US);
F05D2230/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | DÜSENRING FÜR EIN TURBOSTRAHLTRIEBWERK EINES FLUGZEUGS | [2024/01] | English: | TURBOJET ENGINE NOZZLE RING FOR AN AIRCRAFT | [2024/01] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE TURBORÉACTEUR D'AÉRONEF | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 04.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2015089957 (SCHWARTZ ERIC [FR], et al); | [XAI]FR3011270 (SNECMA [FR]); | [XAI]FR3015550 (SNECMA [FR]) |