EP4304421 - AIR DISTRIBUTION UNIT FOR ENVIRONMENTALLY CONDITIONED FURNITURE, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pure-development 1 B.V. Amsterdamsestraatweg 55 A 3744 MA Baarn / NL | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DOORNEWAARD, Barry 3744 MA Baarn / NL | 02 /
STEEGMANS, Michiel Maria Augustinus 3744 MA Baarn / NL | [2024/03] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22710762.0 | 10.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022NL50131 | Priority number, date | NL20212027735 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: NL 2027735 | US202117198108 | 10.03.2021 Original published format: US202117198108 | [2024/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022191705 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304421 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47C21/04, F24F13/24 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A47C21/044 (EP);
A47C21/048 (EP);
F24F2013/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | LUFTVERTEILUNGSEINHEIT FÜR UMGEBUNGSMÖBEL UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2024/03] | English: | AIR DISTRIBUTION UNIT FOR ENVIRONMENTALLY CONDITIONED FURNITURE, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2024/03] | French: | UNITÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'AIR POUR MEUBLES CONDITIONNÉS ÉCOLOGIQUES, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 09.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH04108498 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 25,27,29,30* abstract *; | [Y]CN2191584Y (HUANG MINGTAI [CN]) [Y] 25,27,29,30 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]US10034550 (RYDSUND MATS [SE]) [X] 1-7,21-23,26,28 * column 6, line 52 - column 14, line 17; figures 1-6 * [Y] 25,27,29,30 [I] 8,15-20 | by applicant | EP1804616 |