EP4302037 - ROTARY KILN AND METHOD FOR FIRING CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR LIMESTONE OR DOLOMITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2024/02] | ROTARY KILN AND METHOD FOR BURNING CARBONATE-CONTAINING MATERIAL, MORE PARTICULARLY LIMESTONE OR DOLOMITE | ||
[2024/06] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lhoist Recherche et Développement S.A. Rue Charles Dubois 28 1342 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KACZINSKI, Carsten 44319 Dortmund / DE | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22711214.1 | 07.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP55696 | Priority number, date | EP20210161139 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: EP 21161139 | [2024/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184936 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302037 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4302037 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/16 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
F27B7/162 (EP,US);
C04B2/10 (US);
F27B2007/165 (US);
F27M2003/03 (US);
Y02P40/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHROHROFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BRENNEN VON KARBONATHALTIGEM GUT, INSBESONDERE KALKSTEIN ODER DOLOMIT | [2024/02] | English: | ROTARY KILN AND METHOD FOR FIRING CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR LIMESTONE OR DOLOMITE | [2024/06] | French: | FOUR ROTATIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CUISSON DU PRODUIT CONTENANT DES CARBONATES, EN PARTICULIER CALCAIRE OU DOLOMITE | [2024/06] |
Former [2024/02] | ROTARY KILN AND METHOD FOR BURNING CARBONATE-CONTAINING MATERIAL, MORE PARTICULARLY LIMESTONE OR DOLOMITE | ||
Former [2024/02] | FOUR ROTATIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMBUSTION D'UN MATÉRIAU CONTENANT DU CARBONATE, PLUS PARTICULIÈREMENT DU CALCAIRE OU DE LA DOLOMITE | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR443783 (ADOLF NEGRO [HU]); | [A]DE423492 (POLIET ET CHAUSSON SA ETS); | [I]US2939693 (FLOYD OLD ALBERT, et al); | [AD]EP1903292 (BLUECHER GMBH [DE]); | [AD]JP2008122043 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES, et al) | by applicant | US5975752 | EP1903292 | JP2008122043 |