EP4302089 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A MULTIPLEXED ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meso Scale Technologies, LLC 1601 Research Boulevard Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSIONSKY, Michael Derwood, Maryland 20855 / US | 02 /
KENTEN, John Terrace Boyds, Maryland 20841 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22711386.7 | 28.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US18139 | Priority number, date | US202163155008P | 01.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155008 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022187138 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302089 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, C12Q1/6813, C12Q1/6844 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6804 (EP);
G01N33/582 (US);
G01N2458/10 (EP,US);
G01N2458/30 (US);
G01N2474/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2531/125, C12Q2537/125 (EP);
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2537/125 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES MULTIPLEX-TESTS | [2024/02] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONDUCTING A MULTIPLEXED ASSAY | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉALISATION D'UN DOSAGE MULTIPLEXÉ | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 01.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2018111782 (CEPHEID [US]) [I] 1-123 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3425063 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]) [X] 1-123 * [0038]; [0182]; [0215] et seq.; [0212] et seq.; [0150] et seq.; [0168] et seq.; [0183] et seq.; [0264] et seq. *; | [I]WO2020243579 (10X GENOMICS INC [US]) [I] 1-123* the whole document * | by applicant | US5240863 | US5846485 | US2004191784 | US6977722 | US2009163378 | US7842246 | WO2015175856 | US2016069872 | US2017343466 | - BJOERN et al., "Influence of ipilimumab on expanded tumour derived T cells from patients with metastatic melanoma", Oncotarget, (20170000), vol. 8, no. 16, pages 27062 - 27074 | WO1997IB19193 | WO2015US30925 |