EP4222513 - DETERMINING THE STATE OF HEALTH OF A VEHICLE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/32] | ASCERTAINING THE STATE OF HEALTH OF A VEHICLE BATTERY | ||
[2023/36] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aviloo GmbH Brown-Boveri-Straße 16 2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | [2023/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Wolfgang 2362 Biedermannsdorf / AT | 02 /
MAYERHOFER, Nikolaus 2392 Sulz im Wienerwald / AT | [2023/32] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [2023/51] |
Former [2023/32] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 22711439.4 | 10.03.2022 | [2023/32] | WO2022AT60068 | Priority number, date | AT20210050292 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: AT 502922021 | [2023/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022221891 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4222513 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4222513 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/392, G01R31/367, B60L58/10 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
G01R31/392 (EP,AT);
B60L58/10 (AT);
B60L58/12 (EP);
B60L58/16 (EP);
G01R31/367 (EP,AT);
B60L2240/545 (EP);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
G01R31/371 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,AT)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERMITTLUNG DES GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDS EINER FAHRZEUGBATTERIE | [2023/32] | English: | DETERMINING THE STATE OF HEALTH OF A VEHICLE BATTERY | [2023/36] | French: | DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT DE SANTÉ D'UNE BATTERIE DE VÉHICULE | [2023/32] |
Former [2023/32] | ASCERTAINING THE STATE OF HEALTH OF A VEHICLE BATTERY | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 03.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2016349330 (BARFIELD JR JAMES RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,7-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0075]; figures 1-9; claims 1-20 * [A] 2-6; | [XA]US2020269722 (AYKOL MURATAHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,7-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0078]; figures 1-5; claims 1-20 * [A] 2-6; | [XA]DE102019111979 (TWAICE TECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0093]; figures 1-11; claims 1-16 *[A] 2-15; | [XA]US10942223 (MALLOY LEA [US], et al) [X] 1,7-15 * column 7 - column 19; figures 1-4; claims 1-20 * [A] 2-6 | by applicant | EP3224632 |