Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4308628 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280021529 EP2022056847W EP22711565 US202218282255



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12054582Global Dossier 06.08.2024B2
US2024158572 16.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
EP21163155 17.03.2021
WO2022EP56847 16.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117098795BGlobal Dossier 19.07.2024B
CN117098795 21.11.2023A
Priority number Date
EP21163155 17.03.2021
WO2022EP56847 16.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4308628Global Dossier 30.04.2025B1
EP4308628 24.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
EP21163155 17.03.2021
WO2022EP56847 16.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112023018625 24.10.2023A2
Priority number Date
EP21163155 17.03.2021
WO2022EP56847 16.03.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022194945Global Dossier 22.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
EP21163155 17.03.2021