EP4268201 - A METHOD FOR VEHICLE REGISTRATION NUMBER RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M2M Tech Limited Unit 4, Harrier Park Hawksworth Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDERLAND, Mat Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | 02 /
WOOD, Tim Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | 03 /
SMITH, Mark Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 7PL / GB | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew John, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22711590.4 | 10.03.2022 | [2023/44] | WO2022GB50621 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023170371 | Date: | 14.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4268201 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/62, G06V20/54, G06V30/19 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G06V20/625 (EP);
G06V20/54 (EP);
G06V30/1902 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FAHRZEUGNUMMERN | [2023/44] | English: | A METHOD FOR VEHICLE REGISTRATION NUMBER RECOGNITION | [2023/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECONNAISSANCE DE NUMÉRO D'IMMATRICULATION DE VÉHICULE | [2023/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 27.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2006030985 (LAWIDA ARTHUR [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] , [0037] , [0078] , [0082] - [0087] *; | [I]WO2008099664 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-30* the whole document *; | [I]EP2146324 (ANPR INTERNAT LTD [GB]) [I] 1-30 * paragraphs [0017] , [0058] - [0062] *; | [I]US2013163822 (CHIGOS JOHN D [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * paragraphs [0003] , [0026] , [0036] , [0064] - [0070] *; | [XI]EP3220358 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [X] 1-8,13-15,19,24-30 * paragraphs [0040] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] , [0051] , [0065] , [0080] , [0112] - [0114] - [0120] , [0121] , [0123] , [0133] * * paragraphs [0140] - [0143] - [0145] , [0185] * [I] 9-12,16-18,20-23; | [I]US2018300578 (WILBERT ANTHONY RUSSELL [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0059] , [0101] , [0142] , [0183] - [0192] * |