EP4301603 - DEFECTIVE NOZZLE COMPENSATION MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAILEY, Walter. F Boulder, Colorado 803019270 / US | 02 /
GURUDATH, Nikita Boulder, Colorado 803019270 / US | 03 /
STANICH, Mikel Boulder, Colorado 803019270 / US | 04 /
MANCHESTER, William Boulder, Colorado 803019270 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Ziling Boulder, Colorado 803019270 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22711681.1 | 03.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022JP09086 | Priority number, date | US202117193935 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: US202117193935 | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186325 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301603 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/21, G06K15/02, H04N1/407, H04N1/405 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B41J2/2139 (EP);
H04N1/405 (US);
B41J2/2142 (EP);
G06K15/027 (EP);
H04N1/00015 (US);
H04N1/00034 (US);
H04N1/00045 (US);
H04N1/00068 (US);
H04N1/00087 (US);
H04N1/4015 (US);
H04N1/4053 (EP);
H04N1/4057 (US);
H04N1/4078 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUR KOMPENSATION DEFEKTER DÜSEN | [2024/02] | English: | DEFECTIVE NOZZLE COMPENSATION MECHANISM | [2024/02] | French: | MÉCANISME DE COMPENSATION DE BUSE DÉFECTUEUSE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 16.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002051144 (ILBERY PETER WILLIAM MITCHELL [AU], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 4, 9 * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0113] *; | [A]US2013293611 (UESHIMA MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2016309056 (WAKUI TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0254] - paragraph [0257] * * paragraph [0299] * |