Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4301680 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280018166 DK2022050036W EP22711875 US202218278448



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024228186Global Dossier 11.07.2024A9
US2024132300 25.04.2024A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170097 05.03.2021
WO2022DK50036 04.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117203138Global Dossier 08.12.2023A
Priority number Date
DKPA202170097 05.03.2021
WO2022DK50036 04.03.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4301680Global Dossier 10.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170097 05.03.2021
WO2022DK50036 04.03.2022
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2022184220Global Dossier 09.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170097 05.03.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK181489B 07.03.2024B1
DK202170097 13.09.2022A1
Priority number Date
DKPA202170097 05.03.2021