EP4316030 - USER EQUIPMENT (UE) TRANSMIT POWER CONTROL FOR DUAL SUBSCRIPTION DUAL ACTIVE (DSDA) OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Akash San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22712205.8 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US19360 | Priority number, date | US202117219636 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: US202117219636 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022211990 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4316030 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/22, H04W52/36, H04W52/28, H04W52/14 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H04W52/223 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W52/221 (EP);
H04W52/281 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG FÜR BENUTZERGERÄTE (UE) FÜR DOPPELABONNEMENT-DUALAKTIV (DSDA)-OPERATIONEN | [2024/06] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT (UE) TRANSMIT POWER CONTROL FOR DUAL SUBSCRIPTION DUAL ACTIVE (DSDA) OPERATIONS | [2024/06] | French: | COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE D'ÉMISSION D'ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR (UE) POUR DES OPÉRATIONS À DOUBLE ABONNEMENT ET DOUBLE ACTIVITÉS (DSDA) | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 19.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2016101631 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,14-16,19,25-27,29,30 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058]; figure 1 * [A] 12,24 [I] 2-11,13,17,18,20-23; | [XAI]US2019215783 (CHAKRABORTY SOUMEN [IN]) [X] 1-5,18-21,29,30 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0064]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091] * [A] 12,24 [I] 6-11,13-17,22,23,25-28; | [IA]US10477492 (SEO INKWON [KR], et al) [I] 1-11,13-23,25-30 * column 20, line 65 - column 21, line 6 * * column 20, line 51 - line 64 * * column 21, line 17 - line 49 * * column 22, line 5 - line 8 * * column 22, line 17 - line 19 * * column 22, line 21 - line 33 * [A] 12,24; | [IA]US10708865 (WANG XIAO FENG [US], et al) [I] 1-11,13-23,25-30 * column 21, line 13 - line 15 * * column 21, line 20 - line 42 *[A] 12,24 |