EP4323587 - METHOD AND MACHINE FOR TAMPING A TRACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plasser & Theurer Export von Bahnbaumaschinen Gesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAXBERGER, Harald 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
KOCZWARA, Christian 3264 Gresten / AT | 03 /
OMEROVIC, Samir 4201 Eidenberg / AT | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Haas, Franz Plasser & Theurer Export von Bahnbaumaschinen Gesellschaft m.b.H. Johannesgasse 3 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22712378.3 | 10.03.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022EP56127 | Priority number, date | AT20210050266 | 12.04.2021 Original published format: AT 502662021 | [2024/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218614 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323587 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E01B27/16 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
E01B27/16 (EP,AT);
E01B27/17 (AT,US);
E01B2203/12 (AT,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MASCHINE ZUM STOPFEN EINES GLEISES | [2024/08] | English: | METHOD AND MACHINE FOR TAMPING A TRACK | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET MACHINE DE BOURRAGE D'UNE VOIE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 13.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]AT515801B (SYSTEM 7 RAILSUPPORT GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0034] *; | [AD]AT515801 (SYSTEM 7 RAILSUPPORT GMBH [AT]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017129215 (PLASSER & THEURER EXPORT VON BAHNBAUMASCHINEN GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0019] - [0039] * | by applicant | AT339358B | AT350097B | AT515801 | AT520056 |