blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP4305116

EP4305116 - SILICON-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.12.2023
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.09.2022
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.04.2022
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2025New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Momentive Performance Materials Inc.
260 Hudson River Road
Waterford, NY 12188 / US
[2024/03]
Inventor(s)01 / BINDUMADHAVAN, Kartick
Bengaluru 560100 / IN
02 / CHENG, Diao
White Plains, New York 10603 / US
03 / KONWAR, Debanga Bhusan
Karnataka 560100 / IN
04 / PHUKAN, Monjit
New York 10604 / US
05 / MG, Murali
Karnataka 577424 / IN
06 / HEBBAR, Raghavendra
Karnataka Bangalore 560076 / IN
07 / MISHAR, Praveen
Bangalore 560017 / IN
08 / SIVASUBRAMANIAN, Karthik
Bangalore 560102 / IN
 [2024/03]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2024/03]
Application number, filing date22713160.409.03.2022
[2024/03]
WO2022US19426
Priority number, dateUS202163158437P09.03.2021         Original published format: US 202163158437 P
[2024/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2022192316
Date:15.09.2022
Language:EN
[2022/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP4305116
Date:17.01.2024
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2024/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.09.2022
ClassificationIPC:C09D183/04, C09D183/06, C09D183/08, C09D183/10, C09D183/12, H01M4/00
[2024/03]
CPC:
C09D183/04 (EP,KR); C09D183/08 (EP,US); C08G77/045 (EP,KR);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR); C08G77/20 (EP,KR); C08G77/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/448 (EP,KR); C08G77/46 (US); C08G77/48 (EP,KR);
C08G77/70 (KR); C09D183/06 (EP); C09D183/10 (EP,KR);
C09D183/12 (EP,US); H01M4/621 (EP,KR); H01M4/622 (EP,KR);
H01M4/623 (KR,US); H01M50/411 (EP,KR); H01M50/417 (EP,KR);
H01M50/449 (EP,KR,US); H01M50/489 (EP,KR); C08G77/80 (US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,KR); Y02E60/10 (EP,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2024/03]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF SILICIUMBASIS UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON[2024/03]
English:SILICON-BASED COMPOSITIONS AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF[2024/03]
French:COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE SILICIUM ET LEURS APPLICATIONS[2024/03]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2023National basic fee paid 
04.09.2023Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2023Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2023Examination requested  [2024/03]
04.09.2023Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.04.2024Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2024Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2025Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013236730  (BOESE HOLGER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,19-22,24-28,30-32,34,35* abstract *;
 [X]CN109326767  (NINGDE CONTEMPORARY AMPEREX TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,8,9,19-35 * abstract *;
 [XI]US10655034  (SIMOFF DEBRA A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11-18,29 * abstract * * columns 4-9 * [I] 7;
 [X]US2020275853  (FUTASHIMA RYO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8-10,19-26,28-34 * abstract *
by applicantUS3627722
 US3632557
 US3786081
 US3971751
 US4345053
 US4481367
 US4625012
 US4985491
 US5623044
 US5852137
 US5919888
 US6197912
 US6207794
 US6303731
 US6310170
 US6359101
 US2002198352
 US6515164
 US2004122253
 US6833423
 US2005020706
 US7569653
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.