EP4327471 - DYNAMIC ACCURACY REQUIREMENTS AND PREFERRED SUBARRAY INDICATION FOR POSITIONING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHAVAN, Vasanthan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
AKKARAKARAN, Sony San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LI, Junyi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
TASSOUDJI, Mohammad Ali San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 22713499.6 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022US70972 | Priority number, date | US202117237942 | 22.04.2021 Original published format: US202117237942 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022226442 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327471 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04B7/0691 (EP,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (KR);
G01S5/0236 (KR);
G01S5/0244 (KR);
H04B17/27 (US);
H04B7/04013 (KR);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0639 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP);
H04B7/06952 (KR);
H04B7/15528 (KR);
H04W24/08 (KR);
H04W84/047 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE GENAUIGKEITSANFORDERUNGEN UND BEVORZUGTE SUBARRAYANZEIGE ZUR POSITIONIERUNG | [2024/09] | English: | DYNAMIC ACCURACY REQUIREMENTS AND PREFERRED SUBARRAY INDICATION FOR POSITIONING | [2024/09] | French: | EXIGENCES DE PRÉCISION DYNAMIQUE ET INDICATION DE SOUS-RÉSEAU PRÉFÉRÉ POUR POSITIONNEMENT | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 11.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US10411775 (CHANG YOUNGBIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7,10-12,15-21,24-26 * claim 1 *[A] 8,9,13,14,22,23,27,28; | [XYI]US2021067978 (CHERAGHI PARISA [US], et al) [X] 8,13,14,22,27,28 * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0069]; figures 2A, 2B * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0126]; figure 5 * [Y] 1-7,10-12,15-21,24-26 [I] 9,23 |