EP4302226 - COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SPATIAL DISTRIBUTION OF ELEMENT SIZE VALUES FOR GEOMETRIC BASIC ELEMENTS OF A NETWORK DISPLAY FROM A DIGITAL DISPLAY OF AN OBJECT FOR A SIMULATION OF THE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volume Graphics GmbH Speyerer Strasse 4-6 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALM, Kai 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
FIERES, Johannes 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 22713866.6 | 24.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP54646 | Priority number, date | DE202110104886 | 01.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021104886 | [2024/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184544 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302226 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/23 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06F30/23 (EP);
G06F30/20 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | COMPUTERIMPLEMENTIERTES VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN EINER RÄUMLICHEN VERTEILUNG VON ELEMENTGRÖSSENWERTEN FÜR GEOMETRISCHE GRUNDELEMENTE EINER NETZDARSTELLUNG AUS EINER DIGITALEN DARSTELLUNG EINES OBJEKTS FÜR EINE SIMULATION DES OBJEKTS | [2024/02] | English: | COMPUTER-IMPLEMENTED METHOD FOR DETERMINING A SPATIAL DISTRIBUTION OF ELEMENT SIZE VALUES FOR GEOMETRIC BASIC ELEMENTS OF A NETWORK DISPLAY FROM A DIGITAL DISPLAY OF AN OBJECT FOR A SIMULATION OF THE OBJECT | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ MIS EN OEUVRE PAR ORDINATEUR POUR DÉTERMINER UNE DISTRIBUTION SPATIALE DE VALEURS DE TAILLE D'ÉLÉMENT POUR DES ÉLÉMENTS DE BASE GÉOMÉTRIQUES D'UN AFFICHEUR RÉSEAU À PARTIR D'UN AFFICHEUR NUMÉRIQUE D'UN OBJET POUR UNE SIMULATION DE L'OBJET | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 27.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]US8384716 (YOUNG PHILIPPE GEORGES [GB], et al) [ID] 1-15 * abstract * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 54 *; | [A]WO2015052710 (YOSIBASH ZOHAR [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | US8384716 |