EP4292182 - SYSTEM AND MONITORING FIELD DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Hülshorstweg 20 33415 Verl / DE | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHL, Christopher 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
RETTIG, Thomas 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 03 /
BRUNS, Benjamin 29221 Celle / DE | 04 /
PETROVIC, Sebastian 32257 Bünde / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22713923.5 | 10.03.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022EP56253 | Priority number, date | DE202110106487 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021106487 | [2023/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022194680 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292182 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4292182 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02H1/00, H02H7/26 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H02H1/0015 (EP,US);
H02H1/043 (US);
H02H3/08 (US);
H02H3/44 (US);
H02H7/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND ÜBERWACHUNGSFELDGERÄT | [2023/51] | English: | SYSTEM AND MONITORING FIELD DEVICE | [2023/51] | French: | SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE TERRAIN DE SURVEILLANCE | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 13.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |