EP4292182 - SYSTEM AND MONITORING FIELD DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 19.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Beckhoff Automation GmbH Hülshorstweg 20 33415 Verl / DE | [2024/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHL, Christopher 33415 Verl / DE | 02 /
RETTIG, Thomas 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 03 /
BRUNS, Benjamin 29221 Celle / DE | 04 /
PETROVIC, Sebastian 32257 Bünde / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei WILHELM & BECK Prinzenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [2024/31] | Application number, filing date | 22713923.5 | 10.03.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022EP56253 | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 19.06.2024 | Date of request for unitary effect [2024/30] | 02.07.2024 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2024/31] | 02.07.2024 | Date of registration [2024/31] | 29.05.2024 | Date of legal effect [2024/31] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 02.07.2024 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2024/31] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4292182 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] |