EP4308147 - GEL BASED ON ANNELID HEMOGLOBIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hemarina Aeropole Centre 29600 Morlaix / FR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAL, Franck 29600 MORLAIX / FR | 02 /
LEIZE-ZAL, Elisabeth 29600 MORLAIX / FR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22714187.6 | 14.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022EP56448 | Priority number, date | FR20210002533 | 15.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102533 | [2024/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022194735 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308147 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K38/42, A61K47/36, A61K9/06, A61K9/08, A61P1/02, A61P17/02, A61P17/10 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61K38/1767 (EP);
A61K38/42 (EP,US);
A61K35/62 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP,US);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | GEL AUF BASIS VON ANNELIDHÄMOGLOBIN | [2024/04] | English: | GEL BASED ON ANNELID HEMOGLOBIN | [2024/04] | French: | GEL À BASE D'HÉMOGLOBINE D'ANNÉLIDES | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 14.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2009007532 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * example 4; claims 1, 9 *; | [Y]CN108354951 (BEIJING YIFANG BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * claim - *; | [Y]FR3076713 (HEMARINA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * page 7, lines 6-10; claim - *; | [Y]WO2020104440 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * example 1; claim - *; | [Y]EP3685822 (ORGANES TISSUS REGENERATION REPARATION REMPLACEMENT [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * examples 13, 14; table 6 *; | [Y]FR3100035 (HEMARINA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * claim - *; | [Y] - BATOOL FAREEHA ET AL, "A therapeutic oxygen carrier isolated from Arenicola marina decreased P. gingivalis induced inflammation and tissue destruction", vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-020-71593-8, (20201201), pages 14745 - 214745, SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/s41598-020-71593-8.pdf, XP055860593 [Y] 1-3,5-10,13-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-020-71593-8 | [T] - BATOOL FAREEHA ET AL, "Therapeutic Potential of Hemoglobin Derived from the Marine Worm Arenicola marina (M101): A Literature Review of a Breakthrough Innovation", MARINE DRUGS, Basel, CH, (20210701), vol. 19, no. 7, doi:10.3390/md19070376, ISSN 1660-3397, page 376, XP055860839 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/md19070376 | [T] - ÖZÇELIK HAYRIYE ET AL, "Characterization of a hyaluronic acid-based hydrogel containing an extracellular oxygen carrier (M101) for periodontitis treatment: An in vitro study", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 605, doi:10.1016/J.IJPHARM.2021.120810, ISSN 0378-5173, (20210616), (20210616), XP086713642 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2021.120810 |