Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4313953
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.05.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
23.04.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2024 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
05.01.2024 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2024 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
04.12.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
18.10.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2023 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
30.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
15.06.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|