Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024182461 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | WO2022GB50725 | 23.03.2022 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024511453 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | WO2022GB50725 | 23.03.2022 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117222624 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022GB50725 | 23.03.2022 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3212900 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | WO2022GB50725 | 23.03.2022 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4313953 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | WO2022GB50725 | 23.03.2022 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202104040D0 | 05.05.2021 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB202113583D0 | 10.11.2021 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022200785 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB202104040 | 23.03.2021 | GB202113583 | 23.09.2021 |