EP4308305 - PROFILE COOLING APPARATUS AND COOLING LINE FOR A PROFILE COOLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Extrutec GmbH Feldstraße 25 78345 Moos / DE | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOKOLL, Joachim 78269 Volkertshausen / DE | 02 /
GÜNTER, Uwe 78343 Gaienhofen / DE | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22715015.8 | 14.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022EP56526 | Priority number, date | DE202120101330U | 16.03.2021 Original published format: DE 202021101330 U | [2024/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022194770 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4308305 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/16, B05B1/20, B21C29/00, C21D1/62, B05B1/04 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
B21C29/003 (EP);
B05B1/1672 (EP);
B05B1/202 (EP);
C21D1/60 (EP);
C21D1/62 (EP);
B05B1/04 (EP);
B05B15/652 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | PROFILKÜHLVORRICHTUNG UND KÜHLSTRANG FÜR EINE PROFILKÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2024/04] | English: | PROFILE COOLING APPARATUS AND COOLING LINE FOR A PROFILE COOLING APPARATUS | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE PROFILÉS ET LIGNE DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE PROFILÉS | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | 02.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE2855906 (LECHLER GMBH & CO KG) [I] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [IA]DE3733131 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [I] 1,4-6,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,7,8; | [A]EP1122338 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * |