EP4314444 - OPERATION MONITORING FOR A THICK MATTER CONVEYING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Putzmeister Engineering GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 10 72631 Aichtal / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Ansgar 72631 Aichtal / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22715096.8 | 21.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP57353 | Priority number, date | DE202110107139 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107139 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022200275 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4314444 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/04, F04B1/02, F04B15/02 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
E04G21/0436 (EP,KR,US);
E04G21/0463 (EP,KR,US);
E04G21/0445 (EP,KR);
F04B15/023 (EP,KR);
F04B49/065 (EP,KR);
F04B7/0026 (EP,KR);
F04B7/0049 (EP,KR);
F04B2201/0204 (EP,KR);
F04B2201/0802 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | BETRIEBSÜBERWACHUNG FÜR EIN DICKSTOFFFÖRDERSYSTEM | [2024/06] | English: | OPERATION MONITORING FOR A THICK MATTER CONVEYING SYSTEM | [2024/06] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE LIQUIDES ÉPAIS | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 23.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102013104494 (MPS MATTER PUMPSYSTEME GMBH [CH]); | [X]EP3015625 (CIFA SPA [IT]); | [X]US2016223313 (VIERKOTTEN REINER [DE]); | [X]EP1849931 (ITALIANA FORME ACCIAIO [IT]) |