Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.05.2025 | First examination report | |
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
27.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
22.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
29.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
07.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
19.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |