EP4315019 - VOICE ASSISTANT-ENABLED CLIENT APPLICATION WITH USER VIEW CONTEXT AND MULTI-MODAL INPUT SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Tudor Buzasu Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
TARANOV, Viktoriya Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
GAVRYLENKO, Sergiy Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 04 /
KNAPP, Jaclyn Carley Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 05 /
MCGOVERN, Andrew Paul Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 06 /
SYED, Harris Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 07 /
ESTES, Chad Steven Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 08 /
RUSAK, Jesse Daniel Eskes Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 09 /
BURKETT, David Ernesto Heekin Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 10 /
O'MAHONY, Allison Anne Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 11 /
KUPPUSAMY, Ashok Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 12 /
HARRIS, Jonathan Reed Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 13 /
ALLENDE, Jose Miguel Rady Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 14 /
CARLOMAGNO, Diego Hernan Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 15 /
IRELAND, Talon Edward Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 16 /
PALERMITI, Michael Francis, II Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 17 /
MAINS, Richard Leigh Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 18 /
KRISHNAMURTHY, Jayant Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22715471.3 | 18.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US21011 | Priority number, date | US202163165037P | 23.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163165037 P | US202117364362 | 30.06.2021 Original published format: US202117364362 | US202117508762 | 22.10.2021 Original published format: US202117508762 | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022203968 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4315019 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16, G06F3/0484 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/167 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/165 (EP);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L2015/088 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | SPRACHASSISTENTENAKTIVIERTE CLIENT-ANWENDUNG MIT BENUTZERANSICHTSKONTEXT UND MULTIMODALER EINGABEUNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2024/06] | English: | VOICE ASSISTANT-ENABLED CLIENT APPLICATION WITH USER VIEW CONTEXT AND MULTI-MODAL INPUT SUPPORT | [2024/06] | French: | APPLICATION CLIENT ACTIVÉE PAR ASSISTANT VOCAL AVEC CONTEXTE DE VISUALISATION D'UTILISATEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENTRÉE MULTIMODAL | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008279366 (LINDBERGH DAVID JORDAN [US]); | [I]EP3588267 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [I]EP3246790 (SONY MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS INC [JP], et al) |