EP4302370 - SEMICONDUCTOR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3SP Technologies 307 Square des Champs Elysées 91026 Evry-Courcouronnes Cedex / FR | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTIATI, Mauro 91360 VILLEMOISSON SUR ORGE / FR | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22715549.6 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022EP55527 | Priority number, date | FR20210002154 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102154 | [2024/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184886 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302370 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/32, H01L21/02 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H01S5/3216 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02395 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02463 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02505 (EP,KR);
H01L21/0251 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02546 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02576 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHES HALBLEITERELEMENT | [2024/02] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTO-ÉLECTRONIQUE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 05.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US4731789 (THORNTON ROBERT L [US]); | [I]US2008113497 (TACHIBANA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [IA]US2015060908 (JAIN RAKESH [US], et al); | [XA]WO2020012392 (SILANNA UV TECH PTE LTD [SG]) |