EP4304432 - A SPACE-SAVING DEVICE FOR LIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rizzi, Desiderio Via Baghella, 57 46019 Viadana (MN) / IT | For all designated states Cella, Iuri Via A. Moro, 5 42024 Castelnovo di Sotto (RE) / IT | [2024/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2024/03] | Application number, filing date | 22717017.2 | 08.03.2022 | [2024/03] | WO2022IT00014 | Priority number, date | IT20210005543 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100005543 | IT20220000911U | 07.03.2022 Original published format: IT 202200000911 U | [2024/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022190144 | Date: | 15.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4304432 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J47/16 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A47J47/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] | Title | German: | PLATZSPARENDE VORRICHTUNG FÜR DECKEL | [2024/03] | English: | A SPACE-SAVING DEVICE FOR LIDS | [2024/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCONOMIE D'ESPACE POUR COUVERCLES | [2024/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5660284 (VAUGHN RICHARD C [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [IA]US2014305888 (NALES MICHEL [NL]) [I] 6-12 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0068]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1-5; | [A]US2014319136 (BOCHENEK WIESLAW J [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0051]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2016367026 (HALL DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0128] - [0130]; figure -; claim - * |