Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.12.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] |
08.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
08.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] |
14.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.09.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.08.2023 | Change - representative | |
25.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
09.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
24.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.04.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |