EP4323247 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE FUNCTIONAL SAFETY OF CO-OPERATIVE DRIVING MANOEUVRES, AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Continental-Plaza 1 30175 Hannover / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2024/08] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Vahrenwalder Straße 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUNCK, Sebastian 81739 München / DE | 02 /
ECK, Johannes 81739 München / DE | 03 /
GROTENDORST, Thomas 81739 München / DE | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive Technologies GmbH Intellectual Property Putzbrunnerstr. 69 81739 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22717727.6 | 05.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022DE200066 | Priority number, date | DE202110203732 | 15.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021203732 | [2024/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218483 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4323247 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/08, G08G1/16 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP);
B60W30/09 (US);
B60W30/0956 (US);
B60W60/0015 (EP,US);
B60W60/0016 (EP);
B60W60/0017 (EP);
H04W4/46 (US);
B60W2556/35 (US);
B60W2556/45 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER FUNKTIONALEN SICHERHEIT KOOPERATIVER FAHRMANÖVER UND ELEKTRONISCHE KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG | [2024/08] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING THE FUNCTIONAL SAFETY OF CO-OPERATIVE DRIVING MANOEUVRES, AND ELECTRONIC CONTROL DEVICE | [2024/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA SÉCURITÉ FONCTIONNELLE DE MANOEUVRES DE CONDUITE COOPÉRATIVES, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 15.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |