EP4313634 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF WEAR OF A SIDEWALL OF A TYRE FOR AN URBAN BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMPROBST, Frédéric 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
ARVIS, Vincent 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
LHOSPITALIER, Denis 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
MONTAGNER, Julien 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND Cedex 9 / FR | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22717865.4 | 28.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022FR50573 | Priority number, date | FR20210003319 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2103319 | [2024/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022208012 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313634 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/24 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B60C11/246 (EP);
B60C11/243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES VERSCHLEISSZUSTANDS EINER SEITENWAND EINES REIFENS FÜR EINEN STADTBUS | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE STATE OF WEAR OF A SIDEWALL OF A TYRE FOR AN URBAN BUS | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE L'ÉTAT D'USURE D'UN FLANC DE PNEUMATIQUE POUR BUS URBAIN | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 31.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]KR101981887B (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]IT201800003254 (NEXION SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2021031569 (MACPHERSON ERIC [US]) [A] 1-15* abstract * | by applicant | EP0726173 | JP2003200717 | WO2007045425 | CN201380726Y | WO2011036061 | WO2013118657 | JP2014180904 | KR101981887B | EP3251958 |