EP4347905 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING STEEL PRODUCTS IN THE FORM OF WIRES AND/OR BARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS group GmbH Am SMS Campus 1 41069 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/15] | For all designated states SMS Group GmbH Eduard-Schloemann-Str. 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖBERICH, Michael 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | 02 /
DAUBE, Thomas 47279 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
NERZAK, Thomas 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 04 /
REDOLFI, Nicola 33042 Buttrio / IT | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Kross, Ulrich Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22718929.7 | 29.03.2022 | [2024/15] | WO2022EP58212 | Priority number, date | DE202110205429 | 28.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021205429 | [2024/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022248102 | Date: | 01.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4347905 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/06, C21D9/52 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C21D8/065 (EP,KR,US);
B21B1/16 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/60 (EP,KR);
C21D1/63 (EP,KR);
C21D11/005 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/0075 (EP,KR);
C21D9/5732 (EP,KR);
C22C38/00 (EP);
B21B2201/06 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DRAHT- UND/ODER STABFÖRMIGEN STÄHLEN | [2024/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING STEEL PRODUCTS IN THE FORM OF WIRES AND/OR BARS | [2024/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PRODUITS EN ACIER SOUS FORME DE FILS ET/OU DE BARRES | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2426920 (HOOGOVENS IJMUIDEN BV); | [A]EP0496726 (EVG ENTWICKLUNG VERWERT GES [AT]); | [A]DE4207296 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE], et al); |