EP4320549 - CHIP BODY FOR A CHIP CARD, CHIP CARD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHIP BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient ePayments GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDISCHWEILER, Michael 81825 München / DE | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22720550.7 | 06.04.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022EP25132 | Priority number, date | DE20211001816 | 08.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021001816 | [2024/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022214220 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320549 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, G06K19/02 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G06K19/07722 (EP,US);
G06K19/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Title | German: | KARTENKÖRPER FÜR EINE CHIPKARTE, CHIPKARTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KARTENKÖRPERS | [2024/07] | English: | CHIP BODY FOR A CHIP CARD, CHIP CARD, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CHIP BODY | [2024/07] | French: | CORPS DE PUCE DESTINÉ À UNE CARTE À PUCE, CARTE À PUCE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS DE PUCE | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020250506 (LOTYA MUSTAFA [IE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0360] - [0368] - [ 456]; figures 9,18A *; | [A]US2020364527 (COLEMAN JAMES BRUCE [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0 26]; figures 2-4,6 * |