EP4326268 - TREATMENT OF CNS DISEASES WITH SGC STIMULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tisento Therapeutics Inc. 245 First Street Riverview II, 18th Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIA, Lei Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 02 /
MERMERIAN, Ara Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 03 /
BARDEN, Timothy, Claude Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 04 /
LEE, Thomas, Wai-Ho Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 05 /
IYER, Karthik Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 06 /
RENNIE, Glen, Robert Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 07 /
IYENGAR, Rajesh, R. Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 08 /
JUNG, Joon Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 09 /
RENHOWE, Paul, Allan Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 10 /
CORREIA, Susana Dos, Santos Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | 11 /
GERMANO, Peter Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22721236.2 | 19.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022US25308 | Priority number, date | US202163177023P | 20.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163177023 P | US202163229251P | 04.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163229251 P | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022225902 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4326268 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4985, A61P25/28 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/4985 (EP);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | 07.11.2023 | ME | 07.11.2023 | Validation states | KH | 07.11.2023 | MA | 07.11.2023 | MD | 07.11.2023 | TN | 07.11.2023 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON ZNS-ERKRANKUNGEN MIT SGC-STIMULATOREN | [2024/09] | English: | TREATMENT OF CNS DISEASES WITH SGC STIMULATORS | [2024/09] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES DU SNC AVEC DES STIMULATEURS DE SGC | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 07.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2019126354 (CYCLERION THERAPEUTICS INC [US]); | by applicant | EP0667345 | DE19744026 | DE19830430 | WO0002851 | DE19834044 | DE19834047 | WO0027394 | DE19943635 | DE19942809 | WO03086407 | WO03095451 | WO2009032249 | WO2009094242 | US2009209556 | WO2010065275 | US2010216764 | WO2010099054 | US2010292192 | US2011118282 | US7947664 | US2011201621 | US2011218202 | WO2011119518 | US8053455 | WO2011149921 | WO2012058132 | US2013012511 | US2013072492 | US8420656 | US8455638 | US8507512 | US2013210798 | WO2015187470 | WO2016081668 | WO2017197555 | WO2017200825 | WO2018045276 | WO2019126354 |