EP4331934 - CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR RIDER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFAU, Lars Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22721474.9 | 20.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022IB53668 | Priority number, date | JP20210076946 | 29.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021076946 | [2024/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022229792 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4331934 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, B60W30/182, B60W50/14, B60W50/16, G05D1/02 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B60W30/182 (EP);
B62J50/22 (US);
B60K35/00 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP);
B60W30/16 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP);
B60W50/16 (EP);
G05D1/0011 (EP);
G05D1/0287 (EP);
B60K2360/179 (EP);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60W2050/146 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR FAHRERASSISTENZSYSTEM | [2024/10] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR RIDER ASSISTANCE SYSTEM | [2024/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE POUR SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE AU CONDUCTEUR | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2023 | Translation filed | 29.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2143587 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]); | [Y]US2016229292 (KLEEN ANDRO [DE], et al); | [XAYI]EP3335955 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2019129416 (UPMANUE VIKAS [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2020041188 (INDIAN MOTORCYCLE INTERNATIONAL LLC [US]) |