EP4342191 - DYNAMIC SEAL TESTING AND FEEDBACK FOR AUDIO WEARABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bose Corporation The Mountain Framingham, Massachusetts 01701-9168 / US | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUGER, JR., Daniel M. Berlin, Massachusetts 01503 / US | 02 /
XU, Janet L. Merced, California 95340 / US | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Attali, Pascal Bose Intellectual Property 18, rue de la Bucherie 75005 Paris / FR | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22722044.9 | 21.04.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022US25681 | Priority number, date | US202117326839 | 21.05.2021 Original published format: US202117326839 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022245465 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342191 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R29/00, H04R1/10 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04R29/00 (EP);
H04R1/1041 (US);
H04R1/10 (EP);
H04R1/1016 (US);
H04R25/30 (US);
H04R2460/01 (EP);
H04R2460/15 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE DICHTUNGSPRÜFUNG UND RÜCKKOPPLUNG FÜR AM KÖRPER TRAGBARE AUDIOVORRICHTUNGEN | [2024/13] | English: | DYNAMIC SEAL TESTING AND FEEDBACK FOR AUDIO WEARABLE DEVICES | [2024/13] | French: | TEST D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ DYNAMIQUE ET RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS POUR DES DISPOSITIFS AUDIO HABITRONIQUES | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2011116643 (TISCARENO VICTOR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-12,15-19 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0044] , [0 46] * * paragraph [0047]; figures 1, 7 * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058]; figures 8, 10 * [I] 3,9,13,14,20; | [XI]DE102020117780 (APPLE INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8-12,14-20 * paragraphs [0013] , [0 14] , [0 21] * * paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0 51]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0054]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0068] *[I] 7,13 |