EP4313717 - ARRANGEMENT OF FURNITURE IN A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Mobility GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIEFER, Benno 40233 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
CUYLEN, Jens 42113 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
GRZONA, Andreas 47638 Straelen / DE | 04 /
HÄUSSLER, Andreas 42659 Solingen / DE | 05 /
WILHELM, Markus 41239 Mönchengladbach / DE | 06 /
WINZEN, Andreas 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22722181.9 | 11.04.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022EP59556 | Priority number, date | DE202110204693 | 10.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021204693 | [2024/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022238063 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313717 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B61D33/00, B61D37/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B61D33/0078 (EP);
B61D33/0085 (EP);
B61D37/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON MÖBELN IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2024/06] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF FURNITURE IN A VEHICLE | [2024/06] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE MEUBLES DANS UN VÉHICULE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 23.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US793459 (MITCHELL AUGUST E [US]) [X] 11 * figures 1-17; claim 1 * [A] 1-7,10,12-15[Y] 8,9; | [XAY]FR2671531 (COMPIN ETS [FR]) [X] 1,4,6,12 * page 2, line 27 - page 4, line 7; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,3,7-9,11,13-15 [Y] 5,10; | [XA]DE19539787 (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [X] 1,12 * column 2, line 4 - column 2, line 50; figures 1-3 * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [XA]DE19539788 (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1a-3b * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [XA]JPH1016773 (DAIHATSU DIESEL MFG, et al) [X] 1,12 * column 0006 - column 0026; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [XAY]DE102009056715 (BROECKER MATTHIAS [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,12-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-6d * [A] 4 [Y] 5,8-10; | [XA]GB2531167 (GRM CONSULTING LTD [GB]) [X] 1,12 * page 5, line 30 - page 10, line 22; figures 1-5 * [A] 2-11,13-15; | [XAY]CN106364510B (JIANGSU TONGQING VEHICLE ACCESS CO LTD) [X] 11 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 1-7,10,12-15 [Y] 8,9; | [XA]WO2021002204 (THK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-15 * [A] 2-11,13-15 |