EP4322770 - NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR STIMULATIONG BIFIDOBACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818 LE Amersfoort / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | For all designated states FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Stationsplein 4 3818LE Amersfoort / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOIJESTEIJN, Petronella Johanna 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 02 /
SINGH-POVEL, Cécile Marguerite 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | 03 /
NAUTA, Arjen 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | FrieslandCampina IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22722257.7 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022EP59706 | Priority number, date | EP20210168007 | 13.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21168007 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022218960 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322770 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L33/125, A23L33/21, A61K31/702, A61P1/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A23L33/125 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A23L33/135 (KR);
A23L33/21 (EP);
A23L33/40 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
A23V2200/30 (KR);
A23V2400/513 (KR);
A23V2400/533 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR STIMULIERUNG VON BIFIDOBAKTERIEN | [2024/08] | English: | NUTRITIONAL COMPOSITION FOR STIMULATIONG BIFIDOBACTERIA | [2024/08] | French: | COMPOSITION NUTRITIONNELLE DE STIMULATION DE BIFIDOBACTÉRIES | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012171165 (BUCK RACHAEL [US], et al); | [X]WO2020239724 (FRIESLANDCAMPINA NEDERLAND BV [NL]) | by applicant | WO2011008086 | WO2017046711 | WO2017144062 | WO2018127900 | WO2018157900 |