EP4338460 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING STATIONARY CONDITION OF WIRELESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIYANTO, Basuki Hampshire, Basingstoke ha RG22 4SB / GB | 02 /
BERGGREN, Anders Hampshire, Basingstoke ha RG22 4SB / GB | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Neij & Lindberg AB Pedellgatan 11 224 60 Lund / SE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22722441.7 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022EP59681 | Priority number, date | SE20210050594 | 10.05.2021 Original published format: SE 2150594 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022238070 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4338460 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08, H04W52/02, H04W52/28 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP);
H04W24/10 (US);
H04W64/00 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W52/0254 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES STATIONÄREN ZUSTANDS EINER DRAHTLOSEN VORRICHTUNG | [2024/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING STATIONARY CONDITION OF WIRELESS DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ÉTAT FIXE DE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 16.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2020314868 (TSENG LI-CHUAN [TW], et al); | [YA]WO2020249199 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]); | [XAY]US2021068027 (LEE OANYONG [KR], et al); |