EP4326601 - METHOD TO SEAL AND/OR REINFORCE A CAVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zephyros Inc. 160 McLean Drive Romeo, MI 48065 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PREGHENELLA, Bruno 67140 Gertwiller / FR | 02 /
JUNG, Frédéric 67290 Zittersheim / FR | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22722795.6 | 14.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022EP59979 | Priority number, date | EP20210169151 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21169151 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022223418 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4326601 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/00, B62D29/00, B62D65/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B62D65/00 (EP,US);
B62D25/00 (EP);
B62D29/002 (EP);
B62D27/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABDICHTEN UND/ODER VERSTÄRKEN EINES HOHLRAUMES | [2024/09] | English: | METHOD TO SEAL AND/OR REINFORCE A CAVITY | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SCELLEMENT ET/OU DE RENFORCEMENT D'UNE CAVITÉ | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 20.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003057737 (BOCK LOTHAR JOSEF [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,3,4,5,6,7,8 ** paragraphs [0028] , [0029] *; | [A]WO2009036784 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 18, paragraph 6; figures 1,8 * * page 3, line 5 - line 12 *; | [A]WO2010099825 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,4,5; claims 3,7,10,12 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, line 3 * * page 10, line 17 - line 28 * * page 13, paragraph 4 * | by applicant | US5575526 | US5755486 | US5766719 | US5932680 | US6131897 |