EP4330283 - ANTI-ADGRE2 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANERJEE, Antara Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
HE, Xingyue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
JENNINGS, Shawn Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22723302.0 | 25.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022US26161 | Priority number, date | US202163179756P | 26.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163179756 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022232035 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330283 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C07K16/2896 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/28 (IL,US);
A61P35/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/565 (IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/94 (IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | ANTI-ADGRE2-ANTIKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2024/10] | English: | ANTI-ADGRE2 ANTIBODIES AND USES THEREOF | [2024/10] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-ADGRE2 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 22.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2016053318 (BONDER CLAUDINE SHARON [AU], et al); | [I]WO2018027197 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]); | [I]US2018327506 (KARSUNKY HOLGER [US], et al); | by applicant | WO8902468 | WO8905345 | WO8907136 | US4868116 | US4980286 | US5013556 | WO9207573 | WO9222324 | US5308341 | WO9428027 | US5443505 | US5571698 | US5641640 | US5766886 | US5773019 | WO9846645 | WO9847531 | US5837500 | US6001386 | US6146361 | US6180370 | US6192891 | US6200296 | US6277375 | US6277099 | US6302855 | WO0178693 | US2002026176 | WO2004024156 | WO2004026380 | WO2004060407 | WO2004073551 | US2005271660 | US2009110679 | US7556615 | US8012476 | US2011229489 | WO2012044831 | US8163881 | WO2014087010 |