EP4327395 - SEALED ELECTRIC BATTERY HOUSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ampere SAS 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2024/15] |
Former [2024/09] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATHIEU, Alexandre 76000 ROUEN / FR | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22723433.3 | 19.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022EP60312 | Priority number, date | FR20210004060 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: FR 2104060 | [2024/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022223559 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327395 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/209, H01M50/224, H01M50/24, H01M50/249, H01M50/276, F16J15/06, F16J15/12 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01M50/209 (EP,KR);
H01M50/184 (US);
F16J15/061 (EP,KR);
F16J15/122 (EP,KR);
F16J15/127 (EP);
H01M50/103 (US);
H01M50/186 (US);
H01M50/191 (US);
H01M50/193 (US);
H01M50/224 (EP,KR);
H01M50/24 (EP,KR);
H01M50/249 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | ABGEDICHTETES GEHÄUSE FÜR ELEKTRISCHE BATTERIE | [2024/09] | English: | SEALED ELECTRIC BATTERY HOUSING | [2024/09] | French: | CARTER DE BATTERIE ÉLECTRIQUE ÉTANCHE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]FR3067436 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]); | [XA]WO2020208087 (REINZ DICHTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [XA]US2020408303 (GRUHLER TOBIAS MICHAEL [DE], et al) | by applicant | CN107946515 |