EP4333682 - ENDOSCOPE NAVIGATION SYSTEM WITH UPDATING ANATOMY MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2024/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TATA, Derek Scot Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | 02 /
INGLIS, Peter Douglas Colin Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | 03 /
HAUSE, Alexandra R. Mansfield, Massachusetts 02048 / US | [2024/11] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/11] | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 22723779.9 | 02.05.2022 | [2024/11] | WO2022IB54037 | Priority number, date | US202163185186P | 06.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163185186 P | US202217719007 | 12.04.2022 Original published format: US202217719007 | [2024/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022234431 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4333682 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B34/10, A61B90/00 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61B1/00009 (EP);
A61B1/00097 (EP);
A61B2034/101 (EP);
A61B2034/107 (EP);
A61B2090/365 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/11] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPNAVIGATIONSSYSTEM MIT AKTUALISIERUNGSANATOMIEMODELL | [2024/11] | English: | ENDOSCOPE NAVIGATION SYSTEM WITH UPDATING ANATOMY MODEL | [2024/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION ENDOSCOPIQUE COMPORTANT UN MODÈLE ANATOMIQUE SE METTANT À JOUR | [2024/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/11] | 01.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017209071 (ZHAO TAO [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19,20 * paragraphs [0028] , [ 0029] , [ 0034] - [0036] - [ 0056] , [ 0074] - [0076] * * paragraphs [0084] , [ 0085] , [ 0087] , [ 0088] , [ 0089] * * figures 1, 2, 3A, 7, 8 *; | [XI]WO2020005890 (INTUITIVE SURGICAL OPERATIONS [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10,19,20 * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0026] , [ 0030] , [ 0031] , [ 0036] , [ 0042] , [ 0045] , [ 0047] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0079] * * figures 1, 5, 6 * [I] 8; | [X]US2020195903 (KOMP JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1-10,19,20 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] - [ 0039] , [ 0051] , [ 0052] , [ 0054] , [ 0058] - [0077] ** figures 2, 3C, 4, 7-9 * |