EP4352709 - METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECTS WHICH ARE RELEVANT TO THE SAFETY OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | 15.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mercedes-Benz Group AG Mercedesstraße 120 70372 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUDER, Stefan 70565 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Elisabeth Mercedes-Benz Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG 063- H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22724022.3 | 20.04.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP60418 | Priority number, date | DE20211002918 | 07.06.2021 Original published format: DE102021002918 | [2024/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022258250 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4352709 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/58, G06V40/18 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G06V20/58 (EP,KR);
G06V10/764 (KR);
G06V40/18 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG SICHERHEITSRELEVANTEN OBJEKTEN | [2024/16] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING OBJECTS WHICH ARE RELEVANT TO THE SAFETY OF A VEHICLE | [2024/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJETS PERTINENTS POUR LA SÉCURITÉ D'UN VÉHICULE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IY]DE102006041857 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]); | [Y]EP3407257 (DURA OPERATING LLC [US]); | [A]WO2020157135 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | by applicant | DE102019004075 |