EP4298387 - BULBLESS THERMAL EXPANSION VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker-Hannifin Corporation 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COYLE, Eric R. Washington, Missouri 63090 / US | 02 /
KUNAPULI, Raghujit Prasad Chesterfield, Missouri 63005 / US | 03 /
LARASH, Richard C. Ellisville, MO 63021 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/01] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22724372.2 | 03.05.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US27417 | Priority number, date | US202163184242P | 05.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163184242 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022235632 | Date: | 10.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298387 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/325, F25B41/335 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
F25B41/335 (EP,US);
F25B41/325 (EP);
F25B2500/15 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2513 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | KOLBENLOSES THERMISCHES ENTSPANNUNGSVENTIL | [2024/01] | English: | BULBLESS THERMAL EXPANSION VALVE | [2024/01] | French: | DÉTENDEUR THERMIQUE SANS AMPOULE | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 27.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPS6277575 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-6,9-13,15-27,29 * section "TECHNICAL FIELD OF THE INVENTION" and "DESCRIPTION OF PREFERRED EMBODIMENTS";; figures 1,4 * [Y] 28; | [XY]EP0829690 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1-14,17,18,20-25,29 * column 6; figures 1-2,4 * [Y] 28; | [Y]CN101255931 (YONGLIN DENG [CN]) [Y] 28* figures 4-6,12 *; | [XY]WO2016075897 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9,13,14,24,25,29 * abstract * [Y] 28 |