EP4322834 - SELF-CONTAINED DERMAL PATCH FOR DETECTION OF PHYSIOLOGICAL ANALYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satio, Inc. 33 West Cliff Road Weston, MA 02493 / US | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAWANA, Namal Weston, Massachusetts 02493 / US | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 22724522.2 | 13.04.2022 | [2024/08] | WO2022US24607 | Priority number, date | US202163174956P | 14.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163174956 P | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022221403 | Date: | 20.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4322834 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/145, A61B5/1468, A61B5/1459 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
A61B5/6833 (EP,US);
A61B5/150969 (US);
A61B5/002 (EP);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/14514 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/1459 (EP);
A61B5/1468 (EP);
A61B5/150984 (US);
A61B5/4064 (EP);
A61B5/685 (EP);
A61B5/742 (EP);
A61B5/7435 (US);
A61B5/746 (US);
A61B5/7475 (EP);
A61B2505/01 (EP);
A61B2505/07 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] | Title | German: | EIGENSTÄNDIGES HAUTPFLASTER ZUM NACHWEIS PHYSIOLOGISCHER ANALYTE | [2024/08] | English: | SELF-CONTAINED DERMAL PATCH FOR DETECTION OF PHYSIOLOGICAL ANALYTES | [2024/08] | French: | TIMBRE DERMIQUE AUTONOME POUR LA DÉTECTION D'ANALYTES PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2024/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 14.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006068490 (TANG CHA-MEI [US], et al) [A] 18 * paragraph [0042] *; | [XI]EP1769735 (LIFESCAN SCOTLAND LTD [GB]) [X] 1,4,34-36,41,42,44-46,51-57 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0016] , [0020] , [0022] , [0030] , [0037] , [0042] , [0043] , [0045] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0069] , [0070] , [0072] , [0076] , [0088] , [0090] , [0091] , [0093] , [0096] , [0099] , [0101] , [0120] , [0123] * * figures 2b, 3, 6c, 6d, 6e * [I] 2,3,5-33,37-40,43,47-50,58,59; | [A]US2012277697 (HAGHGOOIE RAMIN [US], et al) [A] 26,37-40,43,48,49 * paragraphs [0147] , [ 148] , [ 157] , [ 194] , [ 198] *; | [A]WO2015072924 (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG]) [A] 2,3,6-33 * page 5, line 43 * * page 6, line 1 * * page 9, lines 17-25 *; | [A]US2017014822 (KER JUSTIN R [SG]) [A] 58,59* paragraphs [0010] , [0 62] *; | [A]WO2019067567 (JUNO DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 5-33,37-40,47,50 * paragraphs [0070] , [0 91] , [ 113] , [ 136] , [ 155] , [ 252] * | by applicant | US9664674 | US10401352 | US2020011860 | US10782285 | US2021102937 |