|
04.03.2025 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2025 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2025 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2025 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2025 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2025 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2025 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
17.09.2024 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2024 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Description |
Search / examination |
87 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.04.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.04.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.03.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2024 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2024 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2024 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2024 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2023 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.11.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.07.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2023 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2023 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2023 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
08.03.2023 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
128 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
113 |
|
14.11.2022 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
120 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
- |
|
27.10.2022 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.10.2022 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
148 |
|
18.08.2022 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is available |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
08.08.2022 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
01.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
01.08.2022 |
Substitute sheet (R26) - Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
17 |
|
03.06.2022 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.06.2022 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Invitation to correct defects in the international application |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
11 |
|
30.05.2022 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
87 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
45 |
|
22.04.2022 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
10 |