EP4329712 - AQUEOUS OXIDATIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ORTHODIPHENOLS OR IMIDAZOLIDIN-2,4-DIONE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UELLNER, Qi 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
BREAKSPEAR, Steven 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
NÖCKER, Bernd 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22725483.6 | 26.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022EP61007 | Priority number, date | EP20210170399 | 26.04.2021 Original published format: EP 21170399 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022229158 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329712 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/22, A61K8/34, A61K8/49, A61Q5/04, A61Q5/08, A61Q5/10, A61K8/46 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61K8/463 (EP);
A61K8/22 (EP,US);
A61K8/347 (EP);
A61K8/4946 (EP);
A61Q5/04 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K2800/4322 (US);
A61K2800/52 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE OXIDATIVE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND ORTHODIPHENOLE ODER IMIDAZOLIDIN-2,4-DIONDERIVATE | [2024/10] | English: | AQUEOUS OXIDATIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ORTHODIPHENOLS OR IMIDAZOLIDIN-2,4-DIONE DERIVATIVES | [2024/10] | French: | COMPOSITION OXYDANTE AQUEUSE COMPRENANT DES DÉRIVÉS D'ORTHODIPHÉNOLS OU D'IMIDAZOLIDINE-2,4-DIONE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 09.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4668236 (GROLLIER JEAN-FRANCOIS [FR], et al); | [XI]WO2016097246 (OREAL [FR]); | [XA]EP3229757 (L'ORÉAL [FR]) |