EP4337277 - CONFORMABLE NEGATIVE-PRESSURE THERAPY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KCI Manufacturing Unlimited Company IDA Business & Technology Park Dublin Road Athlone, Co. Westmeath, N37XF22 / IE | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRATT, Benjamin Andrew Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | 02 /
SEDDON, James Killingworth Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | 03 /
LOCKE, Christopher Brian Bracknell Berkshire RG12 8HT / GB | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22725558.5 | 11.05.2022 | [2024/12] | WO2022IB54374 | Priority number, date | US202163188197P | 13.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163188197 P | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022238919 | Date: | 17.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4337277 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61M1/80 (EP);
A61M1/966 (EP,US);
A61M1/88 (EP);
A61M2205/3331 (EP);
A61M2205/3358 (EP);
A61M2205/42 (EP);
A61M2205/502 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/75 (EP);
A61M2209/088 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Title | German: | ANPASSBARE UNTERDRUCKTHERAPIEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/12] | English: | CONFORMABLE NEGATIVE-PRESSURE THERAPY DEVICE | [2024/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THÉRAPIE PAR PRESSION NÉGATIVE CONFORMABLE | [2024/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018296397 (ASKEM BEN ALAN [GB], et al); | [X]US2020000983 (GORDON BENJAMIN [GB], et al) |