Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
19.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
16.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
16.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
23.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.11.2023 | Change - representative | |
08.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.11.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |