EP4327588 - SERVICE COGNIZANT RADIO ROLE ASSIGNMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESAI, Vishal, Satyendra San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 02 /
HENRY, Jerome Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US | 03 /
BARTON, Robert, E. Richmond, British Columbia V7C 5R6 / CA | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Jarrett, Daniel Phillip, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22725587.4 | 15.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022US25114 | Priority number, date | US202117235413 | 20.04.2021 Original published format: US202117235413 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022225824 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327588 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/08, H04W4/029, H04W4/35 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04W24/08 (EP);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W8/22 (US);
H04W84/22 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | DIENSTBEGRÄNKTE FUNKROLLENZUWEISUNGEN | [2024/09] | English: | SERVICE COGNIZANT RADIO ROLE ASSIGNMENTS | [2024/09] | French: | ATTRIBUTIONS DE RÔLES RADIO DE CONNAISSANCE DE SERVICE | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 14.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018208046 (IPLANET [KR]) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0025] *; | [A]WO2018208045 (IPLANET [KR]) [A] 1-23 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] , [00 8] - [0012] *; | [A]US2020089303 (CANNELL MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * |