EP4330521 - A TURBOMACHINERY PLANT TO MAXIMIZE THE POWER GENERATED BY AN ELECTRICAL REVERSIBLE MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | 05.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Tecnologie S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci, 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTINI, Marco 50127 Florence, Firenze / IT | 02 /
BALDINI, Marco 50127 Florence, Firenze / IT | 03 /
GABBRIELLI, Andrea 50127 Florence, Firenze / IT | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth Baker Hughes 245 Hammersmith Chalk Hill Road London W6 8DW / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22725700.3 | 22.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022EP25172 | Priority number, date | IT20210001097 | 29.04.2021 Original published format: IT202100001097 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022228723 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4330521 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D15/10, F02C3/113, F02C6/00, F02C7/36, F04D25/04, F04D25/06, F04D27/02 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
F04D25/04 (EP,US);
F01D15/10 (EP,US);
F02C3/113 (US);
F02C7/36 (US);
F04D25/06 (EP,US);
F04D27/02 (US);
F04D27/0207 (EP);
F04D27/0261 (EP);
F05D2220/32 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | TURBOMASCHINENANLAGE ZUR MAXIMIERUNG DER VON EINER ELEKTRISCHEN REVERSIBLEN MASCHINE ERZEUGTEN LEISTUNG | [2024/10] | English: | A TURBOMACHINERY PLANT TO MAXIMIZE THE POWER GENERATED BY AN ELECTRICAL REVERSIBLE MACHINE | [2024/10] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TURBOMACHINE POUR MAXIMISER LA PUISSANCE GÉNÉRÉE PAR UNE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE RÉVERSIBLE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012006411 (KURZ RAINER [US], et al); | [A]WO2017059897 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]); | [A]WO2021018412 (NUOVO PIGNONE TECNOLOGIE SRL [IT]) |