EP4351813 - BRIDGING AN INTERRUPTION IN PRODUCTION IN A COMBINED CASTING-ROLLING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LENGAUER, Thomas 4616 Weißkirchen a.d. Traun / AT | 02 /
MAYR, Alexander 4111 Walding / AT | 03 /
PEITL, Wolfgang 4490 St. Florian / AT | 04 /
SEILINGER, Alois 4040 Linz / AT | 05 /
FÜRST, Heinz 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | 06 /
GROSSEIBER, Simon 4060 Leonding / AT | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22726029.6 | 27.04.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022EP61187 | Priority number, date | AT20210050468 | 09.06.2021 Original published format: AT 504682021 | [2024/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022258254 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4351813 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21B15/00 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
B21B15/0007 (EP,AT);
B21B1/463 (AT);
B21B13/22 (AT);
B22D11/12 (AT);
B21B1/46 (EP);
B21B2015/0014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | ÜBERBRÜCKUNG EINER PRODUKTIONSUNTERBRECHUNG IN EINER GIESS-WALZ-VERBUNDANLAGE | [2024/16] | English: | BRIDGING AN INTERRUPTION IN PRODUCTION IN A COMBINED CASTING-ROLLING INSTALLATION | [2024/16] | French: | GESTION D'UNE INTERRUPTION DE PRODUCTION DANS UNE INSTALLATION COMBINÉE DE COULÉE-LAMINAGE | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]KR20130053110 (POSCO [KR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-15; | [IDA]WO2014029544 (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH GMBH [AT]) [ID] 1,2 * the whole document *[A] 3-15 | by applicant | WO2009121678 | DE102013213418 | WO2014029544 |